Terry v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Terry
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and NBS Default Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv02208
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 57 regarding Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/22/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/3/2017 at 1:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 7/27/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/8/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 53 Joint Extending Time for Plaintiff to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/6/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Represented By: Steven Robert Telles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Represented By: Steven Robert Telles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBS Default Services LLC
Represented By: Robert Betuel Norum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?