Daniel L. Flamm, Sc.D. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Daniel L. Flamm, Sc.D.
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Semiconductor Inc and Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv02252
Filed: April 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) CONDITIONALLY GRANTING 82 JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS (2) DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/8/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 2, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PARTIES TO SHOW CAUSE. Re: Dkt. No. 22 . By 8/9, the parties must file an update to their discovery brief indicating whether they wish the discovery dispute to be heard on 8/17 at 1:00 PM or withdrawn without prejudice. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/2/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
April 27, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/27/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel L. Flamm, Sc.D. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel L. Flamm, Sc.D.
Represented By: Robert M. Spalding
Represented By: Rolf O. Stadheim
Represented By: Rolf Otto Stadheim
Represented By: George C. Summerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co Ltd
Represented By: Marc A Cohn
Represented By: Samuel Mark Drezdzon
Represented By: Nicholas Lee
Represented By: Nicholas H Lee
Represented By: Jin-Suk Park
Represented By: Ali R. Sharifahmadian
Represented By: Jennifer Sklenar
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Sklenar
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Matthew M. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Marc A Cohn
Represented By: Samuel Mark Drezdzon
Represented By: Nicholas Lee
Represented By: Nicholas H Lee
Represented By: Jin-Suk Park
Represented By: Ali R. Sharifahmadian
Represented By: Jennifer Sklenar
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Sklenar
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Matthew M. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor Inc
Represented By: Marc A Cohn
Represented By: Samuel Mark Drezdzon
Represented By: Nicholas Lee
Represented By: Nicholas H Lee
Represented By: Jin-Suk Park
Represented By: Ali R. Sharifahmadian
Represented By: Jennifer Sklenar
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Sklenar
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Matthew M. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC
Represented By: Marc A Cohn
Represented By: Samuel Mark Drezdzon
Represented By: Nicholas Lee
Represented By: Nicholas H Lee
Represented By: Jin-Suk Park
Represented By: Ali R. Sharifahmadian
Represented By: Jennifer Sklenar
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Sklenar
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Matthew M. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?