Cobalt Partners, LP, et al v. SunEdison, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Cobalt Partners, LP., Cobalt Partners II, LP, Cobalt Offshore Master Fund, LP and Cobalt KC Partners, LP
Defendant: SunEdison, Inc., Ahmad Chatila, Brian Wuebbels, Martin Truong, Emmanuel T. Hernandez, Antonio R. Alvarez, Clayton Daley, Jr., Georganne Proctor, Steven Tseoriere, James B. Williams, Randy H. Zwirn, Peter Blackmore, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., MCS Capital Markets LLC, Alejandro Hernandez and Terraform Global, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02263
Filed: April 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2017 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY AND TRANSFERRING ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/9/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
October 6, 2016 151 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER (MDL. No 2742) - UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION. The actions listed on Schedule A (3:16-cv-02263-WHA, 3:16-cv-02264-WHA, 3:16-cv-02268-WHA) and pending outside the Southern District ofNew York are transfer red to the Southern District of New York, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable P. Kevin Castel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. ***CAND Civil Case Terminated per MDL Transfer Order. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
September 21, 2016 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING BLOOM ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/21/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 9, 2016 144 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE REGARDING COORDINATION OF CASES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/9/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
September 7, 2016 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/7/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 26, 2016 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) DENYING MOTIONS TO REMAND; (2) GRANTING MOTIONS TO TRANSFER; (3) CERTIFYING ISSUE FOR INTERLOCUTORY REVIEW; AND (4) STAYING ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/26/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 23, 2016 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (131) STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING.Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-02263-WHA, 3:16-cv-02264-WHA, 3:16-cv-02268-WHA(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 8, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (97) APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE.Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-02264-WHA, 3:16-cv-02263-WHA, 3:16-cv-02265-WHA, 3:16-cv-02268-WHA(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 4, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING POSTPONEMENT OF HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/4/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 3, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/3/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 14, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William Alsup in case 3:16-cv-02263-WHA; granting (62) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:16-cv-02268-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-02268-WHA, 3:16-cv-02263-WHA, 3:16-cv-02264-WHA, 3:16-cv-02265-WHA(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 5, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING (73) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AS TO ROBIN E. WECHKIN.Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-02263-WHA, 3:16-cv-02264-WHA, 3:16-cv-02265-WHA, 3:16-cv-02268-WHA(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 27, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION 68 TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 24, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 67 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AS TO ADAM S. HAKKI.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 17, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (52) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF DANIEL C. LEWIS case 3:16-cv-02268-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-02268-WHA, 3:16-cv-02263-WHA, 3:16-cv-02264-WHA(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 7, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (63) STIPULATION RE SCHEDULING ORDER in case 3:16-cv-02263-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-02263-WHA, 3:16-cv-02264-WHA, 3:16-cv-02265-WHA, 3:16-cv-02268-WHA(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
May 31, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 40 REGARDING RELATED CASES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 24, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 48 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 16, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 29 DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 13, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 12, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS OF ATTORNEYS MICHAEL BONGIORNO AND TIMOTHY PERLA 15 16 . (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 10, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT TERRAFORM GLOBAL, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/10/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 4, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/4/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobalt Partners, LP, et al v. SunEdison, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunEdison, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmad Chatila
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Wuebbels
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Truong
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel T. Hernandez
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio R. Alvarez
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Daley, Jr.
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georganne Proctor
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Tseoriere
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Williams
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy H. Zwirn
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Blackmore
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Brett Hammon
Represented By: Timothy J. Perla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCS Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Hernandez
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Daniel H. Bookin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terraform Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cobalt Partners, LP.
Represented By: Jennifer N. Caringal
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Dennis J. Herman
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cobalt Partners II, LP
Represented By: Jennifer N. Caringal
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Dennis J. Herman
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cobalt Offshore Master Fund, LP
Represented By: Jennifer N. Caringal
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Dennis J. Herman
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cobalt KC Partners, LP
Represented By: Jennifer N. Caringal
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Dennis J. Herman
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?