Glenview Capital Partners, L.P. et al v. SunEdison, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Glenview Capital Partners, L.P., Glenview Institutional Partners, L.P., Glenview Capital Master Fund, Ltd., Glenview Capital Opportunity Fund, L.P. and Glenview Offshore Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd.
Defendant: SunEdison, Inc., Terraform Global, Inc., Ahmad Chatila, Brian Wuebbels, Carlos Domenech Zornoza, Martin Truong, Jeremy Avenier, Alejandro Hernandez, Emmanuel Hernandez, Antonio R. Alvarez, Peter Blackmore, Clayton Daley, Jr., Georganne Proctor, Steven Tesoriere, James B. Williams, Randy Zwirn, Barclays Capital Inc., BTG Pactual US Capital LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Agricole CIB, Credit Suisse, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs, & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Macquarie Capital (USA), Inc., MCS Capital Markets LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, , Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Societe Generale, Santander and SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02264
Filed: April 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (71) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AS TO JAMES L. TUXBURY.Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-02268-WHA, 3:16-cv-02264-WHA(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 19, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AS TO RHIANNON A. CAMPBELL AND JAMES L. TUXBURY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/19/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 7, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/7/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
June 24, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 61 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AS TO ADAM S. HAKKI.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 9, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 39 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE AS TO KEVIN O'CONNOR.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 1, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (43 in 3:16-cv-02268-WHA) Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 11, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/11/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenview Capital Partners, L.P. et al v. SunEdison, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenview Capital Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Jennifer N. Caringal
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Dennis J. Herman
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenview Institutional Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Jennifer N. Caringal
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Dennis J. Herman
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenview Capital Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Jennifer N. Caringal
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Dennis J. Herman
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenview Capital Opportunity Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Jennifer N. Caringal
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Dennis J. Herman
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenview Offshore Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Jennifer N. Caringal
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Dennis J. Herman
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunEdison, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terraform Global, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Brett Hammon
Represented By: Timothy J. Perla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmad Chatila
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Wuebbels
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Domenech Zornoza
Represented By: Katharine Ann Kates
Represented By: Kevin J. O'Connor
Represented By: Ismail Jomo Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Truong
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Avenier
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel H. Bookin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel Hernandez
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio R. Alvarez
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Blackmore
Represented By: Brett Hammon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Daley, Jr.
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georganne Proctor
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Tesoriere
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Williams
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Zwirn
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTG Pactual US Capital LLC
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Agricole CIB
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs, & Co.
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Capital (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCS Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: , Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Societe Generale
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?