Bloom et al v. SunEdison, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Charles Bloom and Sharon Burnstein
Defendant: SunEdison, Inc., Ahmad Chatila, Brian Wuebbels, Antonio R. Alvarez, Emmanuel Hernandez, Steven Tesoriere, Clayton Daley, Jr., James B. Williams, Georganne Proctor, Randy H. Zwirn, Peter Blackmore and Terraform Global, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02265
Filed: April 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (79) STIPULATION CONSOLIDATING CASES.Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-02265-WHA, 3:16-cv-04883-WHA(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 19, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE REGARDING CONSOLIDATION OF BLOOM ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/19/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
June 10, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/10/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
June 1, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 20 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bloom et al v. SunEdison, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunEdison, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmad Chatila
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Wuebbels
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio R. Alvarez
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel Hernandez
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Tesoriere
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Daley, Jr.
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Williams
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georganne Proctor
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy H. Zwirn
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Norman J. Blears
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Sarah Alison Hemmendinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Blackmore
Represented By: Brett Hammon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terraform Global, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Timothy J. Perla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bloom
Represented By: John Jasnoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Burnstein
Represented By: John Jasnoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?