Holt v. Facebook, Inc.

Plaintiff: Christine Holt
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02266
Filed: April 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Joint Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 28, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
October 26, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Christine Holt filed by Christine Holt. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 26, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
August 2, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Set Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Anticipated Motion to Dismiss filed by Christine Holt. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 2, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 13, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulated Request to Modify Briefing Schedule and to Vacate Case Management Conference Scheduling and ADR Deadlines filed by Facebook, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Holt
Represented By: Todd M Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?