Rabin v. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP

Plaintiff: Steve Rabin
Defendant: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Case Number: 3:2016cv02276
Filed: April 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2017 152 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 142 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re ESI Document Review Process. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
July 28, 2017 141 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Joint Letter Brief on ESI filed by Steve Rabin, John Chapman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 28, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 24, 2017 138 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Joint Letter Brief on ESI Search Process filed by Steve Rabin, John Chapman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 24, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 14, 2017 135 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 7/14/2017. (tnS) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
May 16, 2017 111 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 110 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - JOINT STIPULATION & (PROPOSED) ORDER RE AGE PROXY AND COMPARATORS filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 16, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
March 29, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to extend time to file Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 29, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 7, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 78 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Joint Letter Brief on Data Discovery filed by Steve Rabin, John Chapman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 7, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
February 21, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Process for Production of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) filed by Steve Rabin, John Chapman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 21, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 17, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 55 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
December 7, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend the Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Vacate the Deadline on Plaintiffs' Conditional Certification Motion filed by Steve Rabin, John Chapman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Stipulated Proposed Protective Order filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
October 11, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Production of Electronically Stored Information filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
September 7, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Steve Rabin. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 3, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for conditional certification of the ADEA collective class 1/26/2017. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings by 6/16/2017. Plaintiff's motion for Rule 23 certification of state law classes 8/17/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 5, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 Joint Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 5, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rabin v. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Rabin
Represented By: Katrina Leigh Eiland
Represented By: Adam T. Klein
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Kohrman
Represented By: Jennifer Lin Liu
Represented By: Laurie A McCann
Represented By: Julia Rabinovich
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Represented By: Dara Swartz Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Represented By: Gabor Balassa
Represented By: Christina Breisacher
Represented By: Michael Phillip Esser
Represented By: Emily Nicklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?