Kinney v. State Bar of California

Plaintiff: Charles Kinney
Defendant: State Bar of California
Case Number: 3:2016cv02277
Filed: April 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT : The State Bars motion to dismiss is hereby GRANTED, and the Amended complaint is hereby DISMISSED in its entirety without leave to amend. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
August 29, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STATE BAR'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DISMISSING AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 29, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
July 21, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from July 29, 2016, to September 30, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than September 23, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 21, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
June 16, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE, AMEND, OR RECONSIDER ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY OR RECUSE; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 16, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 1, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY OR RECUSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 1, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 10, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/10/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinney v. State Bar of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kinney
Represented By: Charles G. Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bar of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?