Doe v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv02298
Filed: April 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Case With Prejudice filed by Jane Doe. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
August 24, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Jane Doe filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 24, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)
May 13, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 7 Administrative Motion to Proceed Under a Pseudonym (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 11, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED USING PSEUDONYM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/11/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: James Pieper Keenley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?