Valle v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Ana Valle
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv02358
Filed: April 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 21 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
June 1, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A RANDOMLY ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/1/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 24, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO INFORM COURT WHETHER SHE CONSENTS TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/24/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valle v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Valle
Represented By: Steven F. Bruce, PWDF
Represented By: James Garrison Gilyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Brenda Maureen Pullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?