Boatwright v. Pacific Gas and Electric Company

Plaintiff: Vincent Boatwright
Defendant: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv02378
Filed: May 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/13/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
May 1, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 STIPULATION - Motion Hearing as to 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment continued to 5/31/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/01/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
August 23, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/23/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boatwright v. Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Boatwright
Represented By: Adam S Gruen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Represented By: Michele Monique Desoer
Represented By: Allen-Michel Daniel Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?