Bandar Foods, Inc. v. Bandar Restaurant, Inc.

Plaintiff: Bandar Foods, Inc.
Defendant: Bandar Restaurant, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02385
Filed: May 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING: 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 21, 2016. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
May 4, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/4/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
May 3, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/3/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bandar Foods, Inc. v. Bandar Restaurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bandar Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Corinna M.W. Charlton
Represented By: J. Scott Gerien
Represented By: Christopher James Passarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bandar Restaurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?