Lunsford v. Seterus, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sheri Lunsford
Defendant: Seterus, Inc., Federal National Mortgage Association and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02389
Filed: May 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/25/2016 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/9/2016. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/3/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
May 24, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/24/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 16, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/16/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 6, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 5 Stipulation to Extend Time for JP Morgan Chase to Respond to Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/6/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lunsford v. Seterus, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Lunsford
Represented By: Marc Steven Applbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seterus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?