Gillespie et al v. Prestige Royal Liquors Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Elliott Gillespie and Rockwood Spirits International
Defendant: Prestige Royal Liquors Corp., Gabriel Sezanayev, Fusion Glassworks, LLC and Private Label Distillery, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv02392
Filed: May 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 75 MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART AND DENYING IN PART. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to So. District of New York. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/31/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
June 28, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 87 Second ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To File Notice Of Supplemental Authority. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
February 1, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 68 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
October 19, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/25/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/19/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 3, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANTS' 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE. ( denying 48 Administrative Motion). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
August 11, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 44 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
July 20, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 40 Second Motion for Pro Hac Vice Knirr, Stefan (terminating 39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Knirr, Stefan).(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 19, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 15, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 32 Stipulation Re Docket No. 31 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 5, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 22 Stipulation Extend Time to Respond. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillespie et al v. Prestige Royal Liquors Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliott Gillespie
Represented By: Kevin Albert Adams
Represented By: Catherine F. Hoffman
Represented By: James Michael Mulcahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockwood Spirits International
Represented By: Kevin Albert Adams
Represented By: Catherine F. Hoffman
Represented By: James Michael Mulcahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Royal Liquors Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Sezanayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fusion Glassworks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private Label Distillery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?