Hoffman v. Intrexon Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Ryan Hoffman
Defendant: Intrexon Corporation, Randal J Kirk and Rick L Sterling
Case Number: 3:2016cv02398
Filed: May 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting 46 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
January 6, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/6/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
August 2, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR FILING CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR ANTICIPATED MOTION(S) TO DISMISS 40 : amended complaint due 9/22/2016, answer to amended complaint due 11/17/2016, any oppositions due 12 /23/2016; replies due 2/2/2017. Initial Case Management Conference continued until a date in early 2017 at the Court's convenience concurrent with the hearing on Defendants' anticipated motion(s) to dismiss or shortly thereafter. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/2/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 25, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 19 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying 23 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying 23 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting 27 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; granting 27 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
June 29, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER [#17] To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/29/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. Intrexon Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hoffman
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intrexon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randal J Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick L Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?