Ultratech, Inc. v. Analog Devices, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ultratech, Inc.
Defendant: Analog Devices, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02409
Filed: May 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer adopting 52 Report and Recommendations.; granting 12 Defendant's Motion to Enforce; denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
July 12, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing Date filed by Analog Devices, Inc. Reset Hearing as to 16 MOTION Enforce Settlement Agreement , 12 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement, Dis miss the Complaint, and Award Attorney's Fees . Motion Hearing reset for 7/22/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/12/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
May 11, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/11/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ultratech, Inc. v. Analog Devices, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ultratech, Inc.
Represented By: Larry Scott Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Analog Devices, Inc.
Represented By: Colin G. Cabral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?