Bosworth v. Cubicon Corporation

Plaintiff: James L. Bosworth
Defendant: Cubicon Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv02416
Filed: May 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/3/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
August 2, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) DENYING MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD; (2) GRANTING PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; AND (3) VACATING HEARING.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/2/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
June 27, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 18 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 10, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bosworth v. Cubicon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Bosworth
Represented By: Hal Michael Clyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cubicon Corporation
Represented By: Yasha Rahimzadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?