Morales et al v. County of Mendocino et al
Plaintiff: Linda Morales, Rudolfo Morales and K. B.
Defendant: County of Mendocino, Jannee Dale, Lisa Allison, Robin Buxton, Buffey Wright, Jennifer Sookne, Mimi Cabral, Susan Rogers and V. W.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02429
Filed: May 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/10/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 228 to reset hearing re 210 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [REDACTED] MOTION for New Trial [REDACTED] and 196 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. Motion Hearing reset for 8/16/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/26/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Apportioning Damages. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/27/2018. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER - FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/21/2018. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 123 Re: Administrative Relief / Enlarge Time to Augment Plaintiff Jury Instruction Submission filed by Linda Morales, K. B. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/28/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 58 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; and Denying 69 Defendant's Administrative Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Briefing. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Mimi Cabral, Buffey Wright, Jennifer Sookne, Robin Buxton, Jannee Dale, County of Mendocino, Lisa Allison, Susan Rogers. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/12/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend County Defendants' Time to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 09/14/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 . Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2016. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/13/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/27/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/20/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales et al v. County of Mendocino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Morales
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolfo Morales
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. B.
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Mendocino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jannee Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Buxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffey Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Sookne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mimi Cabral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?