Muzzi Family Farms, LLC v. East & West Gourmet Food, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Muzzi Family Farms, LLC
Defendant: East & West Gourmet Food, Inc., Nazifa Sidiq, Rhateb Sidiq and Billal Sidiq
Case Number: 3:2016cv02432
Filed: May 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT OF EXECUTION issued (pdyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 2, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/2/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
August 19, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 28 DEFAULT JUDGMENT.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 15, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 32 REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
August 2, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/2/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
June 15, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/15/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
June 9, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING STATEMENT ON STATUS OF CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/9/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 24, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 18 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 12, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; REQUIRING DEFENDANTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS WITHIN THREE CALENDAR DAYS OF PERSONAL SERVICE 4 . Responses due by 5/26/2016. Replies due by 6/2/2016. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/16/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/12/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 5, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Set/Reset Deadlines as to 4 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order or, Alternatively, for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 5/10/2016. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/5/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muzzi Family Farms, LLC v. East & West Gourmet Food, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muzzi Family Farms, LLC
Represented By: Bart Mark Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East & West Gourmet Food, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nazifa Sidiq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhateb Sidiq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billal Sidiq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?