Matias Sola Quirino v. Loretta Lynch, et.al.

Defendant: Loretta E. Lynch, Juan P. Osuna, Sarah Saldana, Jeh Johnson, Craig Meyer, Albert E. Carter and Paul Babeu
Petitioner: Matias Sola Quirino
Case Number: 3:2016cv02464
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 8:1105
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The Clerk shall TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona and close this court's file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/16/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 10, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court hereby issues an order to show cause why this action should not be transferred in the interest of justice to the United District Court for the District of Arizona. If Petitioner does not, by 5/13/2016, file a writte n response to this order which demonstrates why this case should not be transferred, the court will enter a transfer order. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/10/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 6, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila. J Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/6/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matias Sola Quirino v. Loretta Lynch, et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matias Sola Quirino
Represented By: Emily Anne Abraham
Represented By: Gautam J. Jagannath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta E. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan P. Osuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Saldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert E. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Babeu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?