California Berry Cultivars, LLC v. The Regents of the University of California

Plaintiff: California Berry Cultivars, LLC
Defendant: The Regents of the University of California
Case Number: 3:2016cv02477
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2017 399 Opinion or Order of the Court RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice in Light of Settlement. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/22/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
July 5, 2017 370 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in part 355 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 7/5/2017. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
February 8, 2017 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY FROM CBC. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/8/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
September 14, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/14/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
May 10, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING ON APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING HEARING. Signed by Hon. Vince Chhabria on 5/10/2016. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 9, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/9/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Berry Cultivars, LLC v. The Regents of the University of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Berry Cultivars, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Louis Lippetz
Represented By: Frederick Logan McKnight
Represented By: Alexis Adian Houle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Matthew Alan Chivvis
Represented By: Rachel Krevans
Represented By: Wesley Ellsworth Overson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?