Greenberg v. Sunrun Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Carole Lee Greenberg, David Moss, George Cohen and Roxanne Xenakis
Defendant: Sunrun Inc., Lynn Jurich, Bob Komin, Edward Fenster, Jameson McJunkin, Gerald Risk, Steve Vassallo, Richard Wong, Beau Peelle, Eren Omer Atesmen, Reginald Norris, William Elmore, Foundation Capital VI, L.P., Foundation Capital Management Co. VI, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc. and SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02480
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying (83) Motion to Stay in case 3:16-cv-02480-CRB. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
February 9, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 02/09/2017. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
June 28, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing Date by One Week for Plaintiffs Coordinated Motions to Remand. Reset Hearing as to Motion to Remand in (13 in 3:16-cv-02566-CRB, (18 in 3:16-cv-02568-CRB), (16 in 3:1 6-cv-02569-CRB), (13 in 3:16-cv-02570-CRB), (13 in 3:16-cv-02572-CRB), (13 in 3:16-cv-02573-CRB). Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/27/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 8, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting: 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DEFERRING RESPONSE AND VACATING CMC filed by Foundation Capital VI, L.P., et al. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/8/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 6, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES by Judge Charles R. Breyer (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenberg v. Sunrun Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Lee Greenberg
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Moss
Represented By: John Jasnoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Cohen
Represented By: John Jasnoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Xenakis
Represented By: John Jasnoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrun Inc.
Represented By: Su-Han Wang
Represented By: Robert L Webb
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Jurich
Represented By: Su-Han Wang
Represented By: Robert L Webb
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Komin
Represented By: Su-Han Wang
Represented By: Robert L Webb
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Fenster
Represented By: Su-Han Wang
Represented By: Robert L Webb
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jameson McJunkin
Represented By: Su-Han Wang
Represented By: Robert L Webb
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Risk
Represented By: Su-Han Wang
Represented By: Robert L Webb
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Vassallo
Represented By: Su-Han Wang
Represented By: Robert L Webb
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Wong
Represented By: Su-Han Wang
Represented By: Robert L Webb
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beau Peelle
Represented By: Su-Han Wang
Represented By: Robert L Webb
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eren Omer Atesmen
Represented By: Su-Han Wang
Represented By: Robert L Webb
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Norris
Represented By: Su-Han Wang
Represented By: Robert L Webb
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Elmore
Represented By: Su-Han Wang
Represented By: Robert L Webb
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation Capital VI, L.P.
Represented By: Su-Han Wang
Represented By: Robert L Webb
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation Capital Management Co. VI, LLC
Represented By: Su-Han Wang
Represented By: Robert L Webb
Represented By: Anna Erickson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?