Chan et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Wayne Chan and Gladys Chan
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02497
Filed: May 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Gladys Chan, Wayne Chan. Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/20/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
January 20, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 : Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2017. Initial Case Management Conference continued from 1/26/2017 to 3/30/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/20/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
October 20, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 Stipulation to Extend Stay of Action Pending Loan Modification Review filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Case stayed. Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/26/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/20/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
July 22, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Stay Action filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Motions terminated: 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Stay Action filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/22/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
May 16, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 9 Stipulation to Extend Time For Defendant JP Morgan Chase to Respond filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/16/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chan et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Chan
Represented By: Eunji Cho
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Chan
Represented By: Eunji Cho
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?