Congdon et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Chuch Congdon, Ryan Cowden, Anthony Martinez, Jason Rosenberg and Jorge Zuniga
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier, LLC and Rasier-CA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv02499
Filed: May 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order filed by Anthony Martinez, Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Ryan Cowden, Jorge Zuniga, Rasier-PA LLC, Chuch Congdon, Rasier-DC LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Jason Rosenberg. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/15/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
December 8, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Compel and Stay; denying as moot 51 Motion to Certify Class. Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2017. Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland.. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
September 7, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: denying 22 Motion to Stay. The Court VACATES the hearing currently set for September 13, 2016. Parties to file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement no later than 9:00 AM on Monday, September 12, 2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 17, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 31 Order, Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/17/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
August 15, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED.Vacating the Motion Hearing set 8/23/16 and vacating the Case Management Conference set 8/29/16; Denying as moot Dkt. no. 26. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/15/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
June 20, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASE. THIS CASE IS NOT RELATED TO C13-3826 EMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/20/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Congdon et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuch Congdon
Represented By: Andrew A. August
Represented By: Charles M. Auslander
Represented By: George R. Baise, Jr.
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree
Represented By: Brian C. Tackenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Cowden
Represented By: Andrew A. August
Represented By: Charles M. Auslander
Represented By: George R. Baise, Jr.
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree
Represented By: Brian C. Tackenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Martinez
Represented By: Andrew A. August
Represented By: Charles M. Auslander
Represented By: George R. Baise, Jr.
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree
Represented By: Brian C. Tackenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Rosenberg
Represented By: Andrew A. August
Represented By: Charles M. Auslander
Represented By: George R. Baise, Jr.
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree
Represented By: Brian C. Tackenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Zuniga
Represented By: Andrew A. August
Represented By: Charles M. Auslander
Represented By: George R. Baise, Jr.
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree
Represented By: Brian C. Tackenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier-CA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?