Cottrell v. Cordis Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Deanna Cottrell
Defendant: Cordis Corporation, Johnson & Johnson and Cardinal Health, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02500
Filed: May 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND GRANTING REQUEST FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. Supplemental Responses due by 11/14/2016. Replies due by 11/21/2016. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/3/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 5, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 38 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Cordis Corporation to Respond to 36 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 5, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 21, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 34 STIPULATION to Dismiss Cardinal Health, Inc. Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/21/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
May 25, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/25/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016) Modified on 5/25/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cottrell v. Cordis Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordis Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca Baden Chaney
Represented By: Andrew D. Kaplan
Represented By: Kevin Cooper Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Sarah E. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Baden Chaney
Represented By: Andrew D. Kaplan
Represented By: Kevin Cooper Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Cottrell
Represented By: Richard S. Lewis
Represented By: Bonny E. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?