Ridley v. Kaplan International North America, LLC

Plaintiff: Kaitlin Ridley
Defendant: Kaplan International North America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv02536
Filed: May 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/1/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 13, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/13/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
June 24, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 15 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint filed by Kaplan International North America, LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C Spero on 6/24/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ridley v. Kaplan International North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaplan International North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlin Ridley
Represented By: Matthew David Carlson
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?