Amgen Inc. et al v. Sandoz Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Amgen Inc. and Amgen Manufacturing, Limited
Defendant: Sandoz Inc., Sandoz International GmbH, Sandoz GmbH and Lek Pharmaceuticals, d.d.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02581
Filed: May 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Ventura
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 107 . *** (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017) Modified on 9/8/2017 (cl, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2017 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 93 Motion to Stay. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
April 24, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 70 Stipulation Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
January 3, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re: 64 Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/3/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
December 7, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of All Claims and Counterclaims Related to U.S. Patent No. 5,824,784. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg' on 12/7/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
August 8, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE AND CHANGE DEADLINE FOR SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/5/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
May 27, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER TO RELATE CASES 14-04741 RS and 16-02581 JCS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/27/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amgen Inc. et al v. Sandoz Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amgen Inc.
Represented By: Alexander David Baxter
Represented By: Ana J. Friedman
Represented By: Jennifer Gordon
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Groombridge
Represented By: Lois Marie Kwasigroch
Represented By: Arielle K. Linsey
Represented By: Stephen A. Maniscalo
Represented By: Peter Sandel
Represented By: Eric Alan Stone
Represented By: Wendy Ann Whiteford
Represented By: Vernon Michael Winters
Represented By: Jennifer H. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amgen Manufacturing, Limited
Represented By: Alexander David Baxter
Represented By: Ana J. Friedman
Represented By: Jennifer Gordon
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Groombridge
Represented By: Lois Marie Kwasigroch
Represented By: Arielle K. Linsey
Represented By: Stephen A. Maniscalo
Represented By: Peter Sandel
Represented By: Eric Alan Stone
Represented By: Wendy Ann Whiteford
Represented By: Vernon Michael Winters
Represented By: Jennifer H. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz International GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lek Pharmaceuticals, d.d.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?