Doe et al v. City of Novato et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey A Ames and Sasha A. D'Amico
Defendant: City of Novato and Oliver Collins
Case Number: 3:2016cv02590
Filed: May 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (PEACE OFFICER RECORDS) filed by City of Novato, Oliver Collins. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 12, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 44 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
October 24, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE THE DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF ADR PROCESS filed by City of Novato, Oliver Collins. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 24, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 14, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEVER PLAINTIFF D'AMICO'S CLAIMS INTO A SEPARATE ACTION AND GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 18 Motion to Dismiss; denying 20 Motion to Sever. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
September 19, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by City of Novato, Oliver Collins , Jeffrey A. Ames, and Sasha D'Amico filed by City of Novato, Oliver Collins. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
August 31, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC and Related Dates filed by City of Novato, Oliver Collins. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 31, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
July 19, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re. Hearing and Briefing on Motions filed by Jeffrey A Ames, Sasha A. D'Amico. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. City of Novato et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Novato
Represented By: Morin Issac Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Collins
Represented By: Morin Issac Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A Ames
Represented By: Mary Shea Hagebols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sasha A. D'Amico
Represented By: Mary Shea Hagebols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?