Evellard v. LendingClub Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Steeve Evellard
Defendant: LendingClub Corporation, Renaud LaPlanche and Carrie L Dolan
Case Number: 3:2016cv02627
Filed: May 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 401 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/24/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 385 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES (RE: VEAL V. LENDINGCLUB, CASE NO. 5:18-cv-02599-BLF). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/20/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER GRANTING 332 333 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER DENYING 279 MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY DISPUTE HEARING re 270 Discovery Letter Brief[Letter from Lead Plaintiff to Judge Alsup re discovery dispute with LendingClub Defendants re Government Documents] filed by Water and Power Employees' Retirement, Disability and Death Plan of the City of Los Angeles. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/21/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER CONDITIONALLY APPROVING AMENDED CLASS NOTICEORDER re (263 in 3:16-cv-02627-WHA), (264 in 3:16-cv-02627-WHA) filed by Water and Power Employees' Retirement, Disability and Death Plan of the City of Los Angeles. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/17/2017. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Alsup granting 215 Motion to Certify Class; granting in part and denying in part 222 Motion to Shorten Time. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A RESPONSE by Judge William Alsup granting 240 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER RE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTION TO INTERVENE Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/22/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE re (217 in 3:16-cv-02627-WHA) Letter, filed by Water and Power Employees' Retirement, Disability and Death Plan of the City of Los Angeles. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/8/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 210 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 190 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER re (182 in 3:16-cv-02627-WHA) Amended Complaint, filed by Water and Power Employees' Retirement, Disability and Death Plan of the City of Los Angeles Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/16/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, Motions terminated: (142 in 3:16-cv-02627-WHA) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Renaud LaPlanche , (139 in 3:16-cv-02627-WHA) MOTION to Dismiss LendingClub Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by LendingClub Corporation, Lawrence H. Summe rs, Carrie L Dolan, Jeffrey Crowe, Simon Williams, John C. (Hans) Morris, Daniel T. Ciporin, John J. Mack, Mary Meeker, Rebecca Lynn, (148 in 3:16-cv-02627-WHA) MOTION to Dismiss UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO D ISMISS CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT; JOINDER TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS BY LENDINGCLUB DEFENDANTS AND DEFENDANT LAPLANCHE filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Citigroup Global Marke ts Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co.,, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Allen & Company LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/25/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup granting 160 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ***CORRECTED*** ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS AS MODIFIED. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/7/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JONATHAN K. YOUNG PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 145 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONSOLIDATION OF ACTION, Motions terminated: (126 in 3:16-cv-02627-WHA), (125 in 3:16-cv-02627-WHA). Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/9/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING LEAD PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 111 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER RE SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Alsup granting 99 104 109 . (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER TO SUBMIT ALL PROPOSALS UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup on 10/5/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER (1) CONSOLIDATING CASES; (2) APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF; AND (3) INVITING APPLICATIONS FOR LEAD COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/15/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE REGARDING HEARING RE APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/12/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/25/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/8/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AS TO JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evellard v. LendingClub Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steeve Evellard
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LendingClub Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaud LaPlanche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie L Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?