Patino et al v. Franklin Credit Management Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Penny L. Patino and Penny L. Patino's Living Trust
Defendant: Franklin Credit Management Corporation, Bosco Credit LLC and Wolf Firm Corporation, The
Case Number: 3:2016cv02695
Filed: May 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 75 Motion to Dismiss. The court dismisses the plaintiff's TILA claim with prejudice because it is barred by the statute of limitations. The court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over her state-law claims and so dismisses those claims without prejudice. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
April 5, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting the plaintiff's temporary restraining order and establishing the process forward. ECF Nos. 67 , 69 , 70 . (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
February 16, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Dismiss.The court grants in part the defendants' motion and dismisses Ms. Patino's TILA claim but grants leave to amend. The court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over her state-law claims at this time and dismisses them without prejudice. Ms. Patino may file an amended complaint within four weeks. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patino et al v. Franklin Credit Management Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny L. Patino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny L. Patino's Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Credit Management Corporation
Represented By: Abe Gordon Salen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bosco Credit LLC
Represented By: Abe Gordon Salen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolf Firm Corporation, The
Represented By: Abe Gordon Salen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?