DOE v. George Street Photo & Video, LLC

Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Defendant: George Street Photo & Video, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv02698
Filed: May 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 29 Motion to Compel Arbitration; Staying Case. (mejlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
November 10, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
September 26, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why Plaintiff should be allowed to keep proceeding pseudonymously. Show Cause Response due by 10/6/2016. Order vacating 9/29/2016 Case Management Conference.Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action due by 10/13/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/26/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
June 28, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 10 Ex Parte Application to Proceed Under a Pseudonym and for a related Protective Order; ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference to 9/29/2016. Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve Defendant(s) with a copy of this Order within 21 days of its filing and to file a proof of service of such with the Court. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE v. George Street Photo & Video, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: Henry M. Burgoyne, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Street Photo & Video, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?