Gallego v. Johnson

Petitioner: Ericka Shirley Gallego
Respondent: Deborah K. Johnson
Case Number: 3:2016cv02720
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Certificate of Appealability Pursuant to U.S.C. Section 2253. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/22/2017. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
July 28, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 16 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
March 20, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 vacating CMC filed by Ericka Shirley Gallego. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/20/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
December 20, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/20/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
June 29, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Habeas Answer due by 8/29/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/29/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallego v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ericka Shirley Gallego
Represented By: Rose Fay Arfa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deborah K. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?