Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2016cv02732
Filed: May 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 16-cv-7236-KAW. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/17/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
December 22, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING THE REMAINING MOTIONS AS MOOT by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Finding as moot 29 ; Finding as moot 39 Motion to Expedite; finding as moot 43 Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot 46 Motion to Consolidate Cases; finding as moot 48 Administrative Motion ; finding as moot 49 Administrative Motion ; granting 32 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
October 5, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING THE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Denying 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ellinor R Coder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?