Voting Rights Defense Project v. Padilla et al

Plaintiff: American Independent Party, Voting Rights Defense Project, Clara Daims and Suzanne Bushnell
Defendant: Alex Padilla, John Arntz and Tim Dupuis
Case Number: 3:2016cv02739
Filed: May 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/26/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
June 2, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Hon. William Alsup re 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
May 27, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 17 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Response date, if any, is set by the court despite the default phrase of "due by 5/31/16"in this docket text;. Responses due by 5/31/2016. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/27/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 24, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/18/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voting Rights Defense Project v. Padilla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Padilla
Represented By: Sharon Louise O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Arntz
Represented By: Joshua Seth White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Dupuis
Represented By: Raymond S. Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Independent Party
Represented By: William Morris Simpich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voting Rights Defense Project
Represented By: William Morris Simpich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Daims
Represented By: William Morris Simpich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Bushnell
Represented By: William Morris Simpich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?