Rebekah Prewitt et al v. Safeway Inc.

Plaintiff: Rebekah Prewitt and Lauren Barry
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02753
Filed: May 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND; DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY; DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO SUR-REPLY AND TAKE DEPOSITION OF MICHAEL REDGR AVE. Plaintiffs' motion for expedited jurisdictional discovery and plaintiffs' motion to remand are denied. In light of the ruling on plaintiffs' motions, defendant's motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 11, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
July 6, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 6, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 24, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION REQUESTING AN ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF JOSHUA GLIKIN; AND ORDER THEREON. The Court finds good cause to extend the deadline for Safeway to answer or respond to Plaintiffs' complaint to August 1, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 24, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 21, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFORDING DEFENDANT OPPORTUNITY TO FILE SUR-REPLY RE: MOTION TO REMAND; CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 21, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rebekah Prewitt et al v. Safeway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Prewitt
Represented By: Aubry Wand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Barry
Represented By: Aubry Wand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Glikin
Represented By: Layne Hamilton Melzer
Represented By: Proud Usahacharoenporn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?