DS-Concept Trade Invest, LLC

Plaintiff: DS-Concept Trade Invest, LLC
Defendant: Morgan-Todt, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02785
Filed: May 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 43 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. Defendant shall answer the Third Amended Complaint in 21 days. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
December 14, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/9/2017 02:01 PM. Show Cause Response due by 12/30/2016. Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2016 is CONTINUED to January 9, 2017 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/14/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 7, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 27 Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice. Amended Pleadings due by 12/21/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
August 26, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 19 Stipulation; Continuing Case Management Conference; Vacating Dates re Motion to Dismiss; Setting Compliance Hearing. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
May 24, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Richard Seeborg denying 3 Motion for TRO.(vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DS-Concept Trade Invest, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DS-Concept Trade Invest, LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Castricone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan-Todt, Inc.
Represented By: Peter L. Isola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?