Illumina, Inc. et al v. QIAGEN, N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Illumina, Inc. and Illumina Cambridge Ltd.
Defendant: QIAGEN, N.V., QIAGEN GmbH, QIAGEN Gaithersburg, Inc., QIAGEN Sciences, LLC, QIAGEN Inc. (USA), QIAGEN Redwood City, Inc. and Intelligent Bio-Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02788
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER DENYING 208 MOTION TO RELATE. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 PRECLUSION ORDER FOLLOWING REFUSAL TO PRODUCE EVIDENCE AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/1/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/24/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS TO FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 168 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PATENT DISCLOSURES AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 164 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT COMPLAINT TO ASSERT NEW PATENT AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting 149 Motion to supplement.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DISCOVERY RELIEF AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/14/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/10/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER ON SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Alsup granting 98 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 100 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 121 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 127 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 130 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO STAY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 122 Motion to Stay.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/15/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY CLAIRE K. COMFORT by Hon. William Alsup denying 117 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO STAY INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL Motions due by 9/15/2016 at noon. Replies due by 9/20/2016 at noon. Responses due by 9/19/2016 at noon. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/13/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Alsup granting 99 Motion for Leave to File; granting 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/22/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER RE SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Alsup granting 71 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 93 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS AND JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by Hon. William Alsup granting 82 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES by Hon. William Alsup granting 78 Administrative Motion to extend.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER RE SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Alsup granting 37 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 53 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 56 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 6 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 17 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY TYLER ROBERT MARANDOLA PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REQUEST FOR INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/12/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS OF ATTORNEYS ROBERT B. BARON, JR., AND MARC S. SEGAL by Judge Alsup denying 40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REGARDING THE SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO TRANSFER, MOTION TO DISMISS, MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 29 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the Alternative Stay, 31 MOTION t o Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses to 29 and 31 due by 6/27/2016. Replies due by 7/1/2016. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. 13 Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/20/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARYINJUNCTION, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, Motions terminated: 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Responses due by 6/17/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/7/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illumina, Inc. et al v. QIAGEN, N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illumina, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Represented By: Derek C. Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illumina Cambridge Ltd.
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Represented By: Derek C. Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QIAGEN, N.V.
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fisher
Represented By: Winston Liaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QIAGEN GmbH
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fisher
Represented By: Winston Liaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QIAGEN Gaithersburg, Inc.
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fisher
Represented By: Winston Liaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QIAGEN Sciences, LLC
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fisher
Represented By: Winston Liaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QIAGEN Inc. (USA)
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fisher
Represented By: Winston Liaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QIAGEN Redwood City, Inc.
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fisher
Represented By: Winston Liaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intelligent Bio-Systems, Inc.
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?