Davis et al v. RiverSource Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Paul M Davis and Paul M. Davis Revocable Trust of 2011
Defendant: RiverSource Life Insurance Company, Ameriprise Financial, Inc., Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. and Ameriprise Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02801
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/13/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
July 11, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 12 Stipulation to Continue Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by RiverSource Life Insurance Company, Ameriprise Financial, Inc., Ameriprise Holdings, Inc., Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/23/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
June 23, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 12 Stipulation to Continue Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by RiverSource Life Insurance Company, Ameriprise Financial, Inc., Ameriprise Holdings, Inc., Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/23/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. RiverSource Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RiverSource Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda Beth Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Linda Beth Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Linda Beth Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Linda Beth Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul M Davis
Represented By: Francis Joseph Balint, Jr.
Represented By: Ingrid M. Evans
Represented By: Andrew S. Friedman
Represented By: Michael Aaron Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul M. Davis Revocable Trust of 2011
Represented By: Francis Joseph Balint, Jr.
Represented By: Ingrid M. Evans
Represented By: Andrew S. Friedman
Represented By: Michael Aaron Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?