Sauer v. Lateef Investment Management, LP et al

Plaintiff: Matthew F. Sauer
Defendant: Lateef Investment Management LP, Lateef Capital Partners LLC and Ryan F. Willson
Case Number: 3:2016cv02802
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 25 Motion to Compel arbitration and dismissing case.(vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 26, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 9 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
July 25, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to file certain documents re 25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Re-Notice) filed by Lateef Investment Management LP, Lateef Capital Partners LLC, Ryan F. Willson (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
June 21, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 26 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Matthew F. Sauer. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
May 27, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE AN ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 79-5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/26/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sauer v. Lateef Investment Management, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew F. Sauer
Represented By: Joseph L. Fogel
Represented By: David J. Ogles
Represented By: Todd Joseph Ohlms
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Sommer
Represented By: Kyle Allen Withers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lateef Investment Management LP
Represented By: David James Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lateef Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: David James Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan F. Willson
Represented By: David James Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?