Highsmith v. Geico Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Charles A. Highsmith
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv02823
Filed: May 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/31/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
June 16, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE RE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/16/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 7, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Highsmith v. Geico Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Highsmith
Represented By: Jonathan Weston Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Glenn M Kenna
Represented By: Timothy William Kenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?