Collabrx, Inc. v. The Jackson Laboratory

Plaintiff: Collabrx, Inc.
Defendant: The Jackson Laboratory
Case Number: 3:2016cv02838
Filed: May 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Motions terminated: 39 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by The Jackson Laboratory, 40 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [REDACTED] filed by The Jackson Laboratory. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/19/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
November 14, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 on Briefing Schedule and Initial Case Management Conference filed by The Jackson Laboratory re 40 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [REDACTED]. Responses due by 12/2/2016. Replies due b y 12/20/2016. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/14/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
September 15, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 09/15/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
June 15, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/15/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collabrx, Inc. v. The Jackson Laboratory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collabrx, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory S. Cavallo, Esq.
Represented By: James Murray Robinson
Represented By: Jeffrey William Shopoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jackson Laboratory
Represented By: Henry Yee-Der Huang
Represented By: Christine Ezzell Singer
Represented By: Andrew Neil Thomases
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?