Burnthorne-Martinez v. Sephora USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alyssa Burnthorne-Martinez
Defendant: Sephora USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02843
Filed: May 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER RE 85 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Alyssa Burnthorne-Martinez. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/18/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION CONTINUING JULY 11, 2017 HEARING re 67 Stipulation and Proposed Order filed by Alyssa Burnthorne-Martinez, Sephora USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/20/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] re 33 Proposed Order filed by Sephora USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/8/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 21 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2017. Motions due by 12/13/2016. Status Report due by 12/1/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2017 02:00 PM. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/22/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnthorne-Martinez v. Sephora USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Burnthorne-Martinez
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sephora USA, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Elena Heifetz
Represented By: Andrew Ralston Livingston
Represented By: Kathryn Grzenczyk Mantoan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?