Steinle, et al v. United States of America, et al

Plaintiff: James Steinle and Elizabeth Sullivan
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Juan Francisco Lopez-Sanchez, Ross Mirkarimi and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2016cv02859
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 60 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
January 6, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 36 United States' Motion to Dismiss; granting 21 City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint as discussed herein no later than January 27, 2017. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
August 4, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 24 Stipulation Regarding Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint filed by United States of America. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C Spero on 8/4/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
June 24, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 16 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Ross Mirkarimi, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrte Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/24/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinle, et al v. United States of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Steinle
Represented By: Alison E Cordova
Represented By: Alison Elizabeth Cordova
Represented By: Frank Mario Pitre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Sullivan
Represented By: Alison E Cordova
Represented By: Alison Elizabeth Cordova
Represented By: Frank Mario Pitre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Francisco Lopez-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Mirkarimi
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?