Blackburn v. Oracle America, Inc.

Plaintiff: Svetlana Blackburn
Defendant: Oracle America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02925
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Svetlana Blackburn. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/17/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 8, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 VACATING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by Oracle America, Inc. Status Report due by 3/9/2017. Status Conference reset for 3/16/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/8/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
November 29, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR STIPULATED RULE 502(d) ORDER filed by Oracle America, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/29/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
September 1, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 to Continue Initial CMC filed by Svetlana Blackburn. Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/1/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackburn v. Oracle America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Svetlana Blackburn
Represented By: Vijayta R Chetty
Represented By: Daniel Velton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle America, Inc.
Represented By: Erin M. Connell
Represented By: Michael Delikat
Represented By: Kenneth P. Herzinger
Represented By: Renee B. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?