Doe 1 et al v. Xytex Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1 and Jane Doe 2
Defendant: Xytex Corporation, Xytex Cryo International Ltd., Mary Hartley and J. Todd Spradlin
Case Number: 3:2016cv02935
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS XYTEX CRYO INTERNATIONAL, LTD., J. TODD SPRADLIN, M.D., AND MARY HARTLEY FROM AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting 87 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
March 24, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to Dismiss]. Amended Pleadings due by NOON on 4/6/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
February 2, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 72 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
December 7, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/7/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 1, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AFTER EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART STAY OF DISCOVERY by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Stay; denying 11 Motion to Transfer Case. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
October 20, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELEASING SEALED TRANSCRIPT FROM OCTOBER 17, 2016 EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/20/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
September 23, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING USE OF EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/23/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 19, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING EVIDENTIARY HEARING, Motions terminated: 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting a Continuance of Evidentiary Hearing filed by Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 1. Replies due by 11/3/2016. Responses due by 10/27/2016. Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/17/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
August 31, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/31/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 25, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE COURT'S RECORD by Hon. William Alsup granting 32 Motion to Seal Case.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
July 19, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER HOLDING IN ABEYANCE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER Jurisdictional Discovery due by 8/11/2016. Briefs due by 8/25/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 14, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS XYTEX CRYO INTERNATIONAL, LTD., J. TODD SPRADLIN, M.D., AND MARY HARTLEY by Hon. William Alsup granting 24 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
June 13, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 8, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/8/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1 et al v. Xytex Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Brendan C Gannon
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 2
Represented By: Brendan C Gannon
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xytex Corporation
Represented By: Kathleen Humphrey
Represented By: Robert Sanford
Represented By: John L. Supple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xytex Cryo International Ltd.
Represented By: Kathleen Humphrey
Represented By: Robert Sanford
Represented By: John L. Supple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Hartley
Represented By: Kathleen Humphrey
Represented By: Robert Sanford
Represented By: John L. Supple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Todd Spradlin
Represented By: Kathleen Humphrey
Represented By: Robert Sanford
Represented By: John L. Supple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?