James Corbel et al v. 21st Century Oncology of California et al

Plaintiff: James Corbel and Roxanne Haatvedt
Defendant: 21st Century Oncology of California and 21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02944
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Middle District of Florida. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
September 15, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/15/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
September 7, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/7/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
September 5, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (46) APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE AS TO CASIE D. COLLIGNON.Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-02944-WHA, 3:16-cv-03711-WHA(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2016)
August 26, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/26/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
July 28, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 28 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 27, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/27/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Corbel et al v. 21st Century Oncology of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Corbel
Represented By: Carey Gavin Been
Represented By: Eric A. Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Haatvedt
Represented By: Carey Gavin Been
Represented By: Eric A. Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Oncology of California
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Represented By: Daniel Marc Goldberg
Represented By: Matthew D Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Represented By: Daniel Marc Goldberg
Represented By: Matthew D Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?