Hussey v. Ruckus Wireless, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Miguel Hussey
Defendant: Ruckus Wireless, Inc., Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Stallion Merger Sub Inc., Selina Y. Lo, Seamus Hennessy, Gaurav Garg, Mohan Gyani, Georges Antoun, Richard Lynch, Stewart Grierson and Barton Burstein
Case Number: 3:2016cv02991
Filed: June 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 100 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 75 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 87 RESETTING HEARING TIME ON , 75 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and CMC. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/15/2017 11:15 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing reset for 6/15/2017 11:15 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/26/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FROM PAGE LIMITATIONS AND PERMISSION TO FILE CONSOLIDATED BRIEFS ON DEFENDANTS' FORTHCOMING MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed b y Georges Antoun, Stallion Merger Sub Inc., Gaurav Garg, Richard Lynch, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Mohan Gyani, Ruckus Wireless, Inc., Stewart Grierson, Seamus Hennessy, Selina Y. Lo, Barton Burstein. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/24/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting motion and CMC. Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2017. Further Case Management Conference reset for 6/15/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/21/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 42 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 Amending Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Motion Hearing reset for 2/16/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/22/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 For Administrative Relief from Page Limitations and Permission to File Consolidated Briefs on Defendants' Forthcoming Motions to Dismiss filed by Ruckus Wireless, Inc., Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/6/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Complaint due by 10/24/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 09/14/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen CONDITIONALLY granting 11 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussey v. Ruckus Wireless, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Hussey
Represented By: Edward M. Gergosian
Represented By: Frank James Johnson
Represented By: David Todd Wissbroecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruckus Wireless, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stallion Merger Sub Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selina Y. Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seamus Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaurav Garg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohan Gyani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georges Antoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Grierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barton Burstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?