Meyer v. Litzenberg et al

Petitioner: Lorena L. Meyer
Respondent: Karen Litzenberg, Dean Percy, Gaylene Wong, Selvi Stanislaus, Anne Stausboll, Fiona Ma and Betty T. Yee
Case Number: 3:2016cv03010
Filed: June 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 64 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
October 21, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 58 REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 13, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/13/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
August 30, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/30/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Litzenberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lorena L. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Karen Litzenberg
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Lui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dean Percy
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Lui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gaylene Wong
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Lui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Selvi Stanislaus
Represented By: Heather B. Hoesterey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anne Stausboll
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Lui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fiona Ma
Represented By: Heather B. Hoesterey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Betty T. Yee
Represented By: Heather B. Hoesterey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?