Quinn et al v. Cordis Corporation

Plaintiff: Heather Quinn, Brian Quinn, Kathrynn Kirby, Allison Brauer, Edward Brown, Patricia Brown, Michael Hickson, Christina Jones, Nancy Folz, Edward Chizek and Andrew Chapman
Defendant: Cordis Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv03080
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of cases to 16-cv-3076-SI. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/27/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 20, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED POSTPONEMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES - All remaining case management deadlines, including the Initial Case Management Conference, are postponed until a date to be determined by the Court after final resolution of the Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/20/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 5, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PARTIAL STAY - 17 Motion to Stay GRANTED. The July 20, 2016, hearing on the motion to dismiss is VACATED, briefing on that motion is STAYED, and discovery and other case deadlines are STAYED pending resolution of plaintiffs' motion to remand. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/05/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 27, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Defendant's Response to Motion to Stay (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinn et al v. Cordis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Quinn
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Quinn
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathrynn Kirby
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Brauer
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Brown
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Brown
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hickson
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Jones
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Folz
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Chizek
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Chapman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordis Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Cooper Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?