Grant et al v. Cordis Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Geanice Grant, Violet Elaine Kern, Russell Hopkins, Anthony Burbine, Courtney Comer, William Gouge, Rhonda Gail Schenk, Jennifer Allison, Bobby Fuller, Robert Edward Becker, Terry Ann Fountain, Marguerite Norton, James Franklin Williams, Sr., Betty Reed, Clint Hurtado, Mark Wehmeier, Jennifer Schock and Jordan Deed
Defendant: Cordis Corporation and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2016cv03083
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases to 16-cv-3076-SI. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/27/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 18, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Andrew D. Kaplan. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 1, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Cordis Corporation to File Reply to 7 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Strike(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant et al v. Cordis Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geanice Grant
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet Elaine Kern
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Hopkins
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Burbine
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Comer
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gouge
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Gail Schenk
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Allison
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Fuller
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Edward Becker
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Ann Fountain
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marguerite Norton
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Franklin Williams, Sr.
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Reed
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Hurtado
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Wehmeier
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Schock
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Deed
Represented By: Laura Jean Baughman
Represented By: Amorina Patrice Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ramon Lopez
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordis Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Cooper Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?